Quantcast

Got Homework?

Connect with other students for help. It's a free community.

  • across
    MIT Grad Student
    Online now
  • laura*
    Helped 1,000 students
    Online now
  • Hero
    College Math Guru
    Online now

Here's the question you clicked on:

55 members online
  • 0 replying
  • 0 viewing

AravindG Group Title

Note :This is not a question !! Tutorial 3: Math tricks(contd.) Hope you like my tutorial series,Do provide you feedback .You can get the previous ones @http://openstudy.com/users/aravindg

  • one year ago
  • one year ago

  • This Question is Closed
  1. AravindG Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 8

    This trick is much famous but still I would like to add it to the series Multiplication of 11 with any number. (You can't use this rule for other numbers) _________________________________________________________________________ Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1) 234163*11 = 2---2+3---3+4---4+1---1+6---6+3---3 = 2575793 Means insert the sum of 2 successive digits and put 2 terminal digits in its place 2) 45345181*11 = 4---4+5---5+3---3+4---4+5---5+1---1+8---8+1---1 = 498796991 Here an extra case arises Consider the following examples for that 3) 473927*11 = 4+1--- (4+7-10) +1--- (7+3-10) +1--- (3+9-10) +1--- (9+2-10)--- (2+7) ---7 = 5213197 4) 584536*11 = 5+1---(5+8-10)+1---(8+4-10)---(4+5)---(5+3)---(3+6)---6 = 6429896

    • one year ago
  2. AravindG Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 8

    And an additional one for those who knew it already (i dont want to dissappoint anyone :) ) Multiplication of 5 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers) _______________________________________________________________________ Let me explain this rule by taking examples 1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245. 2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265. Understand the rule by 1 more example 5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245.

    • one year ago
  3. AravindG Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 8

    >>my tutorials are published on a daily basis .hope you enjoy these tricks !

    • one year ago
  4. CliffSedge Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Might be worthwhile to point out why multiplying by 5 like that works: Because 5 is half of 10.

    • one year ago
  5. CliffSedge Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    And the multiplication by 11 might make more sense if you start small, like with a two-digit number. ex.1. 63 × 11 = 6 _ 3. In the _ goes (6+3). 63 × 11 = 693. Note that there is room in the _ only for a one digit number. 78 × 11 = 7 _ 8. In the _ goes (7+8), but there is only room for the 5, so carry the 1. 78 × 11 = 858. Doing the reverse of this process can also let you tell if a number is divisible by 11. ;-)

    • one year ago
  6. hartnn Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @AravindG what reference are you using for this tutorials ? i have learned these exact tricks years ago from a book.

    • one year ago
  7. geoffb Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    There's an app for Mac computers called Mathemagics. It has tons of tricks like this.

    • one year ago
  8. hartnn Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    O.o any windows or linux counterpart ?

    • one year ago
  9. geoffb Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Not sure. I searched it, and it's available on the iPhone, too (which is a bit more ubiquitous). http://www.bluelightninglabs.com/apps/mathemagics

    • one year ago
  10. hartnn Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    same trick can be applied when multiplied by 111. just take three consecutive digits sum also. example : 431 * 111 = 4 ---4+3-----4+3+1-----3+1-----1 = 47841 15344 *111 = 1---(1+5)+1---(1+5+3-10)+1----(5+3+4-10)+1 ---(3+4+4-10)---(4+4)----4 = 1703184 and same for 1111 , 11111 and so on.

    • one year ago
  11. AravindG Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 8

    @CiffSedge thanks for adding that to the tutuorial :) @hartnn its from a Indian book entitled "Vedic mathematics"

    • one year ago
  12. hartnn Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    i used 'Vedic Maths made Easy' by Dhaval Bhatia

    • one year ago
  13. AravindG Group Title
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 8

    i see ... then its not surprising that you have seen these tricks before ! most math tricks are got from vedic texts as they encouraged mental thinking than blind working even from ancient time !

    • one year ago
    • Attachments:

See more questions >>>

Your question is ready. Sign up for free to start getting answers.

spraguer (Moderator)
5 → View Detailed Profile

is replying to Can someone tell me what button the professor is hitting...

23

  • Teamwork 19 Teammate
  • Problem Solving 19 Hero
  • You have blocked this person.
  • ✔ You're a fan Checking fan status...

Thanks for being so helpful in mathematics. If you are getting quality help, make sure you spread the word about OpenStudy.

This is the testimonial you wrote.
You haven't written a testimonial for Owlfred.