Quantcast

Got Homework?

Connect with other students for help. It's a free community.

  • across
    MIT Grad Student
    Online now
  • laura*
    Helped 1,000 students
    Online now
  • Hero
    College Math Guru
    Online now

Here's the question you clicked on:

55 members online
  • 0 replying
  • 0 viewing

AravindG

Note :This is not a question ! Vedic Mathematics tutorials (contd...) ...Hope you find it useful ! Pleaase provide your feedback !happy studying !

  • one year ago
  • one year ago

  • This Question is Closed
  1. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    \[\huge VEDIC \;\;\;\; MATHS \]

    • one year ago
  2. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    .Adding Time _______________ Here is a nice simple way to add hours and minutes together: Let's add 1 hr and 35 minutes and 3 hr 55 minutes together. What you do is this: make the 1 hr 35 minutes into one number, which will give us 135 and do the same for the other number, 3 hours 55 minutes, giving us 355 Now you want to add these two numbers together: 135 355 ___ 490 So we now have a sub total of 490. What you need to do to this and all sub totals is add the time constant of 40. No matter what the hours and minutes are, just add the 40 time constant to the sub total. 490 + 40 = 530 So we can now see our answer is 5 hrs and 30 minutes!

    • one year ago
  3. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    Multiplication of 99 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers) Let me explain this rule by taking examples ____________________________________________ 1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554. 2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838. Understand the rule by 1 more example 2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259

    • one year ago
  4. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    Square of a 2 digit number ending with 5 (You can't use this rule for other numbers) _______________________________________________________________________________ Let me explain this rule by taking examples 35^2 = 3*(3+1) ---25 = 1225 Example. Other example 95^2 = 9*(9+1) ---25 = 9025

    • one year ago
  5. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    Multiplication of any two numbers, both ranging from 11 to 19. (You can’t use this rule for other numbers) ____________________________________________________________________________________ Let me explain this rule by taking examples 13*19 = (13+9)*10 + (3*9) = 220 + 27 = 247 Means add first number and last digit of the second number take zero in the third place of this number then add product of last digit of the two numbers in it. Example. 18*14 = (18+4)*10 + (8*4) = 220 + 32 = 252

    • one year ago
  6. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    wel thats end of today's tutorial :) hope you all found it useful ! P.S. wish i was better at latexing could have made it more attractive :)

    • one year ago
  7. nitz
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    NICE.............!!!!!!!!

    • one year ago
  8. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    thanks @nitz

    • one year ago
  9. hba
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Have you given multiplication of 11 with any number ?

    • one year ago
  10. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @AravindG Nice! Post others soon.

    • one year ago
  11. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    @hba yep it was there in my previous tutorial

    • one year ago
  12. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    @mathmate thanks :)

    • one year ago
  13. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    good job...... @AravindG

    • one year ago
  14. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    thanks @mayankdevnani

    • one year ago
  15. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    can you solve it and then clear to me. 29*15=? in 10 sec.

    • one year ago
  16. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    @AravindG can you???

    • one year ago
  17. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    (30-1)(30)/2

    • one year ago
  18. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    plz reply by drawing!!!!

    • one year ago
  19. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    900-30/2

    • one year ago
  20. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    |dw:1357742825809:dw|

    • one year ago
  21. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    :)

    • one year ago
  22. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    yaaa......another one !!!!!! can i?

    • one year ago
  23. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    haha u testing me? :P

    • one year ago
  24. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    I would do 30*15-15=435

    • one year ago
  25. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    no!!!!!! its a nice .....tutorial for checking it

    • one year ago
  26. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    thats also a nice method @mathmate

    • one year ago
  27. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Bring in more (tests) !!!

    • one year ago
  28. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    yep @mayankdevnani

    • one year ago
  29. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    @mathmate how you do this?

    • one year ago
  30. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    56^2 plz reply by drawing

    • one year ago
  31. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    No drawing required, it's mental math. 3136=(25+6)*100+6^2

    • one year ago
  32. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    The 6's comes from (56-50).

    • one year ago
  33. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    @mathmate nice one :)

    • one year ago
  34. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    So 59^2=3481

    • one year ago
  35. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    i don't understand!!!!!!

    • one year ago
  36. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    |dw:1357743155347:dw|

    • one year ago
  37. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Here how this works: We split 56=50+6 So 56^2 = 50^2+2*50*6 + 6^2 = 2500+600 + 6^2 =(25+6)*100+6^ QED

    • one year ago
  38. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    6^2

    • one year ago
  39. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    no, by vedic method!!!!

    • one year ago
  40. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    that calls for me :)

    • one year ago
  41. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    yaaa

    • one year ago
  42. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    tring,tring @AravindG olz attend the call

    • one year ago
  43. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    \( \huge 56^2 = (50+6)^2 = 50^2+2*50*6+6^2 =2500+600+6^2 =(25+6)*100+36 \)

    • one year ago
  44. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    i know it @mathmate can you solve it? by vedic method @AravindG

    • one year ago
  45. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @mayankdevnani do you do Vedic math?

    • one year ago
  46. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    pls wait i am a bit bsy

    • one year ago
  47. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    no....

    • one year ago
  48. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    plz fast @AravindG i have 2 min ....then i have to eat food....

    • one year ago
  49. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Intellectual matters trump over food, unless of course you are "requested" to eat food by a superior being.

    • one year ago
  50. mayankdevnani
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    thnx....... m waiting for your response.......in advance thank you... @AravindG and @mathmate for your convinient answer

    • one year ago
  51. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    well in this method we take something called base for computation of square

    • one year ago
  52. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Interesting "rencontre". Will meet some other time! Thanks to all! :)

    • one year ago
  53. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @Aravindg Keep going!

    • one year ago
  54. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    for 56^2 we take 50 as base

    • one year ago
  55. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    ok now what we do is find out deficiency or excess from base .here it is +6

    • one year ago
  56. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @AravindG Still there? I am listening. @mayankdevnani will read it later! :)

    • one year ago
  57. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    srry i am multitasking talking to a friend also ! :P

    • one year ago
  58. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    ok then ...then we add the excess to the original number that will be 56+6=62

    • one year ago
  59. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    now multiply this number with the base ,here we took base as 50 so 62*50=2100

    • one year ago
  60. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    *3100

    • one year ago
  61. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    oops 3100

    • one year ago
  62. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    ya now simple add square of deficiency to get final answer! ie 3100+(6)^2=3136 thats all!

    • one year ago
  63. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    yep! That's great, because it works for all squares. The one I showed only works around 50 (special case that you can add to Vedic math! :P )

    • one year ago
  64. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    exactly i am planning to explain this topic in detail in next tutorial !! thanks to all those who made this tutorial more interactive and interesting.

    • one year ago
  65. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Send me an invitation in your next tutorial! Until now, I don't know anything about Vedic math, but I love mental math! Thanks and talk to you soon! :)

    • one year ago
  66. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    seeya !

    • one year ago
  67. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    :)

    • one year ago
  68. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    |dw:1357799017114:dw|

    • one year ago
  69. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    3136

    • one year ago
  70. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    It's also another fast method using identities ;)

    • one year ago
  71. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Vedic maths, consisting fastest techniques for calculation, gr8 work @AravindG , keep it up ;)

    • one year ago
  72. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    thanks! :)

    • one year ago
  73. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    2500+36+600=3136, right ;)

    • one year ago
  74. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    hw abt 78^2 ? @jiteshmeghwal9 dont write calculate in mind

    • one year ago
  75. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    ............?

    • one year ago
  76. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    (80-2)^2=(80)^2+(2)^2-2(80)(2)=?

    • one year ago
  77. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    did u do that in ur head?

    • one year ago
  78. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    6400+4-320=6404-320=5084 & no, I only remembered the property :)

    • one year ago
  79. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    sorry folks gtg ....gn8 !

    • one year ago
  80. jiteshmeghwal9
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Ok ! bye ;)

    • one year ago
  81. ashlynn143
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    very informative !!

    • one year ago
  82. matricked
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    @mayankdevnani check if it helps u 56^2 square of 6 is 36 and square of 5 is 25 hence square of 56 is (25+6)36=3136 square of 59 is (25+9)81=3481 square of 52 is (25+2)04=2704.... and so on only for nos between 51 -59

    • one year ago
  83. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    i liked this special case mathmate mentioned :)

    • one year ago
  84. RyanL.
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Wait is this the same math that I see on TV ads?

    • one year ago
  85. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    TV ads o.O?

    • one year ago
  86. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    this is vedic maths

    • one year ago
  87. matricked
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    there are many more like these silly things i doubt fo Vedic maths

    • one year ago
  88. RyanL.
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    Yeah I've seen this on TV. People selling videos and tell you how to do it. They advertise it as a world secret or something lol

    • one year ago
  89. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    lol i do this for free @RyanL.

    • one year ago
  90. RyanL.
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    lol yeah I know it's just funny how it reminded me of that TV ad.

    • one year ago
  91. matricked
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    Mathematics should be used to simplify understanding and pacify computation rather than jolting from simpler to a long computing technique

    • one year ago
  92. mathmate
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 1

    You can use the same method for 78^2 (excess = 28) 78^2 = (25+excess)*100 + excess^2 = 5300+784=6084 Same as before, but you need to know 28^2=784. Alternatively, you do deficiency of 78 (from 100) = 22 78^2 = (78-deficiency)*100+deficiency^2=(78-22)*100+22^2=5600+484=6084 If you don't memorize/calculate large squares like 22 or 28, you can use the Vedic method: Deficiency from 80 = 80-78=2 78^2=(80-deficiency)*80+deficiency^2=80*76+2^2=6080+4=6084 You can do all of the above in your head.

    • one year ago
  93. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    :)

    • one year ago
  94. tamtoan
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    there's one problem with the method of adding time...for example: 1:00 + 1:00 = 2:00 right? 100 + 100 = 200 and 200+40 = 240 so it's 2:40 ...not 2:00 there should be one more condition under certain circumstance to use your method for adding time.

    • one year ago
  95. AravindG
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 17

    @tamtoan thanks for pointing it out ..But I think that case is already understood if one of the time is x:00 and other is y:z we actually do not need any trick at all we already know that the sum =x+y:z .

    • one year ago
  96. tamtoan
    Best Response
    You've already chosen the best response.
    Medals 0

    how about , 1:20 + 1:25 = 2:45 but 120+125+40 =285 so what is the time with 285 now ?

    • 11 months ago
    • Attachments:

See more questions >>>

Your question is ready. Sign up for free to start getting answers.

spraguer (Moderator)
5 → View Detailed Profile

is replying to Can someone tell me what button the professor is hitting...

23

  • Teamwork 19 Teammate
  • Problem Solving 19 Hero
  • You have blocked this person.
  • ✔ You're a fan Checking fan status...

Thanks for being so helpful in mathematics. If you are getting quality help, make sure you spread the word about OpenStudy.

This is the testimonial you wrote.
You haven't written a testimonial for Owlfred.