At vero eos et accusamus et iusto odio dignissimos ducimus qui blanditiis praesentium voluptatum deleniti atque corrupti quos dolores et quas molestias excepturi sint occaecati cupiditate non provident, similique sunt in culpa qui officia deserunt mollitia animi, id est laborum et dolorum fuga. Et harum quidem rerum facilis est et expedita distinctio. Nam libero tempore, cum soluta nobis est eligendi optio cumque nihil impedit quo minus id quod maxime placeat facere possimus, omnis voluptas assumenda est, omnis dolor repellendus. Itaque earum rerum hic tenetur a sapiente delectus, ut aut reiciendis voluptatibus maiores alias consequatur aut perferendis doloribus asperiores repellat.
learn to add fast
and subtract fast
Yeah! One for 9's is to use your fingers in a pattern way. Let me try to show you what I mean. Say it is 9X5. Hold both hands out in front of you palms facing away. Then start with your left hand's pinkie and count five over. That would be your left hand thumb. Put it down. then you can see that you have 4 fingers left on your left hand and 5 fingers left on your right hand. Your answer is 45.
Another for 10's is to take your number and add a zero to it. 10 X 3 = 30. ect.
U can skip 5 10
and 2 \
Well, 11's is easy because it's just that number twice. like 11 X 2 = 22 etc.
when u get to 10,11,12 what do you do?
You can use the 10's trick for that one (11X10 = 110). 11+ 0. And for 11 X 11 it's the same, the number twice, except you add a 2 in the middle of it. I don't know a trick for that one, I just remember it because it's a sandwich. 1's on the outside and the two ones = 2 which is on the inside of the sandwich. And 11 X12 is you take the first number (1) add the second numbers (2+1 = 3) and take the 2 from the 12. so 11 X 12 = 132. I know that that one is another tip more than trick, but that's all I can think of.
what is wrong with just adding 11 to 11*10
this is the decimal system
every digit place holder holds 10 unique numbers from 0 - 9 hence the 'deci'mal system
For the 9x1 to 9x10 list, you just hold up your fingers. Say you're doing 9x6. Put down the sixth finger from the left, and count. There are five fingers to the left of the one you put down, and four to the right. So the number is 54.
there is an easy trick for squaring 25, 5, 45, 55, etc
for example \(65^2\) you think \(6\times 7=42\) so answer is \(4225\)
\(75^2\) think \(7\times 8=56\) answer is \(5625\)