anonymous
  • anonymous
Did I do this right? SA= 2(3 ½ + 11 ½ ) + 2(11 ½ + 11 ¾ ) + 2(3 ½ + 11 ¾ ) SA = 2(30) + 2(46.5) + 2(30.5) SA= 60 + 93 + 61 SA= 214
Mathematics
  • Stacey Warren - Expert brainly.com
Hey! We 've verified this expert answer for you, click below to unlock the details :)
SOLVED
At vero eos et accusamus et iusto odio dignissimos ducimus qui blanditiis praesentium voluptatum deleniti atque corrupti quos dolores et quas molestias excepturi sint occaecati cupiditate non provident, similique sunt in culpa qui officia deserunt mollitia animi, id est laborum et dolorum fuga. Et harum quidem rerum facilis est et expedita distinctio. Nam libero tempore, cum soluta nobis est eligendi optio cumque nihil impedit quo minus id quod maxime placeat facere possimus, omnis voluptas assumenda est, omnis dolor repellendus. Itaque earum rerum hic tenetur a sapiente delectus, ut aut reiciendis voluptatibus maiores alias consequatur aut perferendis doloribus asperiores repellat.
jamiebookeater
  • jamiebookeater
I got my questions answered at brainly.com in under 10 minutes. Go to brainly.com now for free help!
anonymous
  • anonymous
It looks like you already multiplied everything by two in the second step and put it in parenthesis. So, the additional 2 outside would not be needed at this point.
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA = 2(15) + 2(23.25) + 2(15.25) should be what you have in step 2.
anonymous
  • anonymous
|dw:1440632662356:dw|

Looking for something else?

Not the answer you are looking for? Search for more explanations.

More answers

anonymous
  • anonymous
Basically step 2 should be SA = 2(15) + 2(23.25) + 2(15.25).
anonymous
  • anonymous
oh ok
anonymous
  • anonymous
So all i have to do is do SA = 2(15) + 2(23.25) + 2(15.25) and get my answer?
anonymous
  • anonymous
It looked like you accidentally multiplied by 2 going to that step and didn't realize it. Otherwise it would be (30) + (46.5) + (30.5). But that would require two steps.
anonymous
  • anonymous
correct
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok let me see what i get
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok 107?
anonymous
  • anonymous
That is correct. Also there is another way you could have done it which would give the same answer. Since everything is multiplied by 2, you can separate it and add everything else together.
anonymous
  • anonymous
yea i think i would have liked it better that way
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA= 2(3 ½ + 11 ½ ) + 2(11 ½ + 11 ¾ ) + 2(3 ½ + 11 ¾ ) SA = 2(3 ½ + 11 ½ + 11 ½ + 11 ¾ + 3 ½ + 11 ¾ ) SA= 2(53 ½) SA= 107
anonymous
  • anonymous
i have another question can you just explain it to me what it means?
anonymous
  • anonymous
4. What is the surface area of the box if it is scaled up by a factor of 10? its with the same question i asked before
anonymous
  • anonymous
I dont know what it wants me to do
anonymous
  • anonymous
Scaling something by a factor essentially means multiplying everything in the equation by that factor.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Since your factor is 10, you would simply multiply the Surface Area you already have by that factor (10).
anonymous
  • anonymous
so 107/10?
anonymous
  • anonymous
107 * 10
anonymous
  • anonymous
Out of curiosity, what was the original question that brought you to your work that you originally asked about?
anonymous
  • anonymous
1,070 right?
anonymous
  • anonymous
1. List the dimensions of your box. Be sure to include the units (in, cm, ft., etc.). 2. Describe the shape of the cross section when the box is cut parallel to the base. 3. What is the surface area of the box? 4. What is the surface area of the box if it is scaled up by a factor of 10? 5. What is the volume of the box? 6. What is the volume of the box if it is scaled down by a factor of ½?
anonymous
  • anonymous
OK, we need to back up to your original question as you set up the formula wrong.
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok ok #work lol
anonymous
  • anonymous
hehe, it happens. Did you have to pick an item to measure or was dimensions already give to you?
anonymous
  • anonymous
i had to pick it
anonymous
  • anonymous
i just chose a binder
anonymous
  • anonymous
The formula for SA is 2 ( lw + lh + hw) or 2(lw) + 2(lh) + 2(hw) where the letters besides each other mean to multiply, not add.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Sorry, I didn't think about your equation when you asked, was just making sure the math was correct.
anonymous
  • anonymous
So, you would be multiply fractions by using those measurements.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Would you like to try something different or keep with the binder?
anonymous
  • anonymous
um i already have the measurements so keep it lol
anonymous
  • anonymous
Ok, so now you would have SA= 2(3 ½ * 11 ½ ) + 2(11 ½ * 11 ¾ ) + 2(3 ½ * 11 ¾ )
anonymous
  • anonymous
135.125?
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA= 2(3 ½ * 11 ½ ) + 2(11 ½ * 11 ¾ ) + 2(3 ½ * 11 ¾ ) SA= 2(40.25 ) + 2(135.125 ) + 2(41.125 )
anonymous
  • anonymous
sorry, this place is annoying with fractions. .125 would be 1/8
anonymous
  • anonymous
433!
anonymous
  • anonymous
correct
anonymous
  • anonymous
yes!!
anonymous
  • anonymous
Now, since we are dealing with multiplying in our original equation instead of adding it changes the factor question somewhat.
anonymous
  • anonymous
how would it be different?
anonymous
  • anonymous
It is like saying SA = 2(10l * 10w) + 2(10l * 10h) + 2(10w * 10h)
anonymous
  • anonymous
essentially you are multiplying all of your measurements by 10 and changing the equation to those new measurements.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Since what really changes is you add are now multiplying by 10 * 10. So instead of 10 you would multiply your final answer by 100 instead. This part is simply a shortcut and if you are required to show your work you may have to multiply each measurement by 10 and redo the work.
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA= 2(35 + 115 ) + 2(115 + 117.5 ) + 2(35 + 117.5 )
anonymous
  • anonymous
This would be your new formula if you multiplied each side by 10.
anonymous
  • anonymous
oops, i made a mistake on that last formula, ignore it.
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA= 2(35 * 115 ) + 2(115 * 117.5 ) + 2(35 * 117.5 )
anonymous
  • anonymous
i was confused too lol ok
anonymous
  • anonymous
There, fixed. sorry, was trying to copy and paste to save time and messed up. Will be extra careful from now on.
anonymous
  • anonymous
i got a crazy number...
anonymous
  • anonymous
13512.5??
anonymous
  • anonymous
Should have got 43300
anonymous
  • anonymous
hmm let me check my work
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok yep now i got 43300
anonymous
  • anonymous
multiplied wrong
anonymous
  • anonymous
SA= 2(35 * 115 ) + 2(115 * 117.5 ) + 2(35 * 117.5 ) SA= 2(4025 ) + 2(13512.5 ) + 2(4112.5) SA = 8050 + 27025 + 8225 SA = 43300
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok, awesome
anonymous
  • anonymous
The biggest thing in math is to learn your formulas. As long as you start with the right formula, chances are you will do really well.
anonymous
  • anonymous
There are so many though.
anonymous
  • anonymous
I memorize most of them but i have trouble with long ones
anonymous
  • anonymous
Usually math teachers will give you a sheet with the formulas when you take tests so it is generally ok to use one when doing homework.
anonymous
  • anonymous
true lol
anonymous
  • anonymous
Don't worry, I think we all have that problem. Trying to remember all of the formulas can be tough. It doesn't hurt to try and set up your work from memory but before you actually start doing it, go back and make sure you had the formula right.
anonymous
  • anonymous
The volume of a rectangular prism is V=bh right? i think im wrongl ol
anonymous
  • anonymous
Also, I find it helpful to right down the formula before starting the work.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Volume is in three dimensions so you would have a third measurement there. V = lhw
anonymous
  • anonymous
oh ok so it would be.... V= 11 3/4 x 11 1/2 x 3 1/2
anonymous
  • anonymous
right
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok so the answer to that is....
anonymous
  • anonymous
(doing the work lol)
anonymous
  • anonymous
LOL, see why i asked if you wanted to measure something else. :) Ask your teacher if it is okay to round up for future reference that way you aren't haven't to spend so much time on one problem.
anonymous
  • anonymous
472.938??
anonymous
  • anonymous
i will thx lol :)
anonymous
  • anonymous
Yes, basically.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Ok, what do you think it means to scale the box down by 1/2?
anonymous
  • anonymous
Subtract by 1/2 i guess?
anonymous
  • anonymous
Not quite. like I said before, a factor is a number you multiply by. So, you would multiply each of your sides by 1/2. Or, in other words, half of your original measurements.
anonymous
  • anonymous
OHhhhhhhh!
anonymous
  • anonymous
so half of 3.5, half of 11.5, and half of 11.75
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok that would beeee....
anonymous
  • anonymous
Hope you are ok with me doing decimals, should have asked I know your original measurements are in fractions. That doesn't confuse you, does it?
anonymous
  • anonymous
Not really i mean its the same thing
anonymous
  • anonymous
That is great that you can see that they are the same right away. That means you are doing really good in math :)
anonymous
  • anonymous
I guess lol im a 7th grader but i have 9th grade class. Algebra Honors
anonymous
  • anonymous
That doesnt mean i dont need help though lol. 1.75 5.75 5.875?
anonymous
  • anonymous
Correct, so do your Volume calculations with those new numbers and you will be good to go. And, you are right. We all need help sometimes.
anonymous
  • anonymous
ok ok the volume will be...
anonymous
  • anonymous
Eh idk about this answer V= 59.1171875
anonymous
  • anonymous
That is very close to exact. If I was you, I would just round that to 59. Also, you could probably round the last answer to 473.
anonymous
  • anonymous
Ok that would make more sense than to put the whole thing
anonymous
  • anonymous
Thank you so much for your time
anonymous
  • anonymous
Np, glad I could help.
anonymous
  • anonymous
I honestly do really appreciate it! :)

Looking for something else?

Not the answer you are looking for? Search for more explanations.